Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nikolay Avtonomov

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ratiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1894Born
1918²23.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 193036.0Ordained BishopBishop
5 Dec 193642.6AppointedArchbishop
1945¹50.7Converted
6 Oct 194551.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
13 Aug 197985.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolay Avtonomov
Archbishop Nikolay Avtonomov (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ratiaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSergiyevskaya
Ordained BishopRussian Federation

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 49.2 years

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1930, Number 28
  • b/abp: CB, 15 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast