Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Altobello de Averoldi

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola)


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1497AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
6 May 1498Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
1 Nov 1531DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Altobello de Averoldi:
Bishop Altobello de Averoldi (died ) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

  • a bishop for 33.5 years

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 276
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,943
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013