Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Parsegh Petros IV Avkadian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Dec 1780SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
25 Jun 1781ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
6 Feb 1788DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Parsegh Petros IV Avkadian
Patriarch Parsegh Petros IV Avkadian (died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018