Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal de Ávila Guzmán

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹BornAvila, Spain
5 Jun 159648.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 159749.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
8 Jan 159951.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
20 Jan 160658.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Ávila Guzmán:
Cardinal Francisco de Ávila Guzmán (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

  • a cardinal for 9.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 247, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014