Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iņigo de Avalos, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1528AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
6 Sep 1528Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Italy
1543²DiedBishop of Aquino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iņigo de Avalos:
Bishop Iņigo de Avalos O.S.B. , Bishop of Aquino

  • a bishop for 14.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 41, Number 199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 114
  • ob: CB, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014