Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Augusto

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1809Born
23 Mar 183324.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187162.9AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
1872¹63.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
16 Dec 187970.9DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Augusto
Bishop Benedetto Augusto (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColliano, Archdiocese of Conza e Campagna

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 333
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017