Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustin Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Oct 1261AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
2 Mar 1262Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
12 Apr 1286DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustin Pérez:
Bishop Agustin Pérez (died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 383
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,695
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 296, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 17 Feb 2014