Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andreas Cardinal von Austria (÷sterreich)

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1558Born
19 Nov 157618.4Elevated to Cardinal
11 Dec 157719.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
15 Jun 158022.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
31 Jul 158931.1AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
8 Jan 159031.5Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Jan 159132.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Feb 159132.6SucceededBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 Nov 160042.4DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Andreas von Austria (÷sterreich) (VIAF: 35262397)
Andreas Cardinal von Austria (÷sterreich) (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle, Bresnitz
Death PlaceApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria dell'Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
  • a cardinal for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1576
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,631
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,590, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast