Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Arundel

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1496AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 1496Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
8 Apr 1502AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
14 Mar 1504DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Arundel:
Bishop John Arundel (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 377, and Page 555
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 152, and Page 135
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 193
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013