Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Arundel

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1459AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
3 Jun 1459Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 1477DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Arundel:
Bishop John Arundel (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 18.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,465
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 128
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013