Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Arthur

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1469AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
10 Sep 1469Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
19 Jul 1486DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Arthur
Bishop Thomas Arthur (died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,469, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast