Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Arteaga Dicastillo

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1650Born
11 Apr 170756.3AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
Jun 1707³56.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
17 Sep 170756.7DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Arteaga Dicastillo
Bishop Juan Arteaga Dicastillo (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbeiza

  • a bishop for .2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 26, Number 55
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018