Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro de Arrupe y Gondra, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1907BornBilbao, Spain
30 Jul 193628.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 May 196557.5AppointedSuperior General of Society of Jesus
3 Sep 198375.8ResignedSuperior General of Society of Jesus
5 Feb 199183.2DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Arrupe y Gondra
Father Pedro de Arrupe y Gondra S.J. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of Jesus

  • a priest for 54.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Mar 2016