Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gabriele Arosio, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Neghelli, Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1892Born
3 Apr 191522.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 191927.1Perpetual VowsPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
21 May 193744.6AppointedPrefect of Neghelli, Ethiopia
194249.2ResignedPrefect of Neghelli, Ethiopia
26 Jul 196370.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Neghelli, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Arosio
Father Gabriele Arosio P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Neghelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndia

  • a priest for 48.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018