Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Aretio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1346AppointedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
24 Sep 1346Ordained BishopBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
13 Jul 1351DiedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece

MicroData Summary for François de Aretio
Bishop François de Aretio O.P. (died ) Bishop of Nemosia (Limasol)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPaphos, Diocese of Paphos, Cyprus

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 367
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jul 2021

Quantcast