Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín Antonio de Arellano, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1635BornTudela de Navarra
15 Sep 169863.7AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
21 Sep 169863.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
11 Nov 169964.8DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agustín Antonio de Arellano:
Archbishop Agustín Antonio de Arellano O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 240, Number 1,486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013