Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Gregorius Ardizzoni, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1625Born
5 Feb 165125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
28 Aug 165630.7AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
22 Nov 168559.9DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Joannes Gregorius Ardizzoni
Bishop Joannes Gregorius Ardizzoni C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabia

  • a priest for 34.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,656, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast