Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal Ardinghelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fossombrone, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1503Born
13 Jul 154138.3AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
19 Dec 154441.7Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154541.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
16 Mar 154743.9ResignedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
23 Aug 154744.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Ardinghelli (VIAF: 9487645)
Niccolò Cardinal Ardinghelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast