Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugues d’Arcy

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1341AppointedBishop of Laon, France
Feb 1341²Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
24 Oct 1351AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
18 Feb 1352DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugues d’Arcy
Archbishop Hugues d’Arcy (died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Death PlaceReims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 296, and Page 419
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,734
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Jun 2020

Quantcast