Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Arcimboldo

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1426²BornMilan or Parma
20 Nov 146842.0AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
7 May 147346.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 147346.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
30 Dec 147650.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
15 Nov 148357.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
25 Oct 148457.9AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
2 Oct 148861.8DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Arcimboldo:
Cardinal Giovanni Arcimboldo (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a cardinal for 15.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013