Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guþmundur Góþi Arason

Deceased

Bishop of Hólar, Iceland


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1203AppointedBishop of Hólar, Iceland
13 Apr 1203Ordained BishopBishop of Hólar, Iceland
16 Mar 1237DiedBishop of Hólar, Iceland

MicroData Summary for Guþmundur Góþi Arason
Bishop Guþmundur Góþi Arason (died ) Bishop of Hólar

  • a bishop for 33.9 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,057
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast