Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Francos Arango

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1702Born
1727¹24.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 176966.9AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
14 Jan 177067.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
11 Feb 177572.3DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Francos Arango (VIAF: 220464466)
Bishop Alonso Francos Arango (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuinzanas

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 86, Number 438
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017