Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José de Jesús Arango Velázquez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1907Born
15 Jun 193527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Apr 195446.4AppointedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
28 Nov 196962.0ResignedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
2 Jan 197769.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Arango Velázquez
Father José de Jesús Arango Velázquez O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Guapi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelén, Archdiocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 41.5 years

Source(s):
  • bp/op/r: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast