Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal Apolloni

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1823BornAnagni, Italy
20 Mar 185026.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 188966.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 188966.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
3 Apr 189369.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Achille Apolloni:
Cardinal Achille Apolloni (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013