Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Angelo Antolini, O.F.M. Cap.

Prefect of Robe, Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1953 Born
6 Jun 197623.0Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Sep 197724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Feb 201258.7AppointedPrefect of Robe, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Angelo Antolini
Father Angelo Antolini O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Prefect of Robe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Vittoria in Matenano, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Robe.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018