Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Antonelli

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1806Born
184033.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Jun 184741.1Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jun 184741.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
10 Mar 184841.9AppointedSecretary of State
3 May 184842.0ResignedSecretary of State
6 Dec 184842.6AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
18 Mar 185245.9AppointedSecretary of State
13 Mar 186861.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
6 Nov 187670.5DiedSecretary of State

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Antonelli (VIAF: 27077770)
Giacomo Cardinal Antonelli (born , died ) Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonnino, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 29.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54, and Page 55
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 11, and Page 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast