Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Deacon Tommaso Antici

Deceased


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1731BornRecanati
30 Mar 178957.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 178958.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
2 Feb 179058.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Sep 179867.3ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
4 Jan 181280.7Died

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Antici:
Deacon Tommaso Antici (born , died ) of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 9.4 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013