Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Antalfi

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Sep 1691Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 1692Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 1724SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
20 Dec 1724ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
1725¹Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
10 Jun 1728DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Antalfi
Bishop Johannes Antalfi (died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Martin de Transilvanie

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018