Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos Anes (Ares) Jardo

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
Dec 1282²AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
17 Jun 1284AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
24 Mar 1285Ordained BishopBishop of Évora, Portugal
7 Oct 1289AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
16 Dec 1293DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingos Anes (Ares) Jardo
Bishop Domingos Anes (Ares) Jardo (died ) Bishop of Lisboa

  • a bishop for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast