Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joćo Anes Escudeiro

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹Born
25 Feb 138343.1AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
10 Nov 139353.8AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 Mar 140262.1DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Anes Escudeiro
Archbishop Joćo Anes Escudeiro (born 1340, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast