Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martinho Anes de Zamora

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1373AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
7 Feb 1379AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
6 Dec 1383DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Martinho Anes de Zamora
Bishop Martinho Anes de Zamora (died ) Bishop of Lisboa

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452, and Page 507
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast