Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Andaya y Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1622³Born
165633.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 167855.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
13 Nov 167856.1DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Andaya y Sotomayor
Bishop Juan de Andaya y Sotomayor (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntequera

  • a priest for 22.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 219, Number 1,357
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018