Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Andreasi

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1467¹BornMantova
20 Mar 153871.2AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
Feb 1540³73.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Apr 1542³75.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
2 Apr 154477.2AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
22 Jan 154982.0DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Andreasi (VIAF: 25689874)
Bishop Giorgio Andreasi (born 1467, died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 171
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016