Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Józef Ancuta

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1662BornBresten
1 Oct 171048.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Oct 171048.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
14 Jun 171755.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
24 Oct 172260.8SucceededBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
18 Jan 172361.0DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Maciej Józef Ancuta:
Bishop Maciej Józef Ancuta (died ) Bishop of Vilnius

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 271, and Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013