Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Amyot

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1513Born
11 Dec 157057.1AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
29 Apr 157157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Auxerre, France
6 Feb 159379.3DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Amyot (VIAF: 17218275)
Bishop Jacques Amyot (born , died ) Bishop of Auxerre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMélun
Ordained BishopS. Denis du Pas, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceAuxerre, Diocese of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018