Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Alvarez López, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1613Born
15 Jul 167561.5AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
17 Jun 168874.4DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Alvarez López
Bishop Clemente Alvarez López O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNava del Rey

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 213, Number 1,327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,675, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast