Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Nicolau de Almeida, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1761Born
22 Nov 177917.9ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
18 Dec 178422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
3 May 181957.3SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
29 May 182058.4ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
31 Aug 182058.6Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
11 Dec 182563.9DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Nicolau de Almeida
Bishop Manuel Nicolau de Almeida O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Franca de Xira

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,523
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 76
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018