Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Almeida (Cotignus)

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1493AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
19 Jun 1499AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
7 Jan 1500DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Almeida (Cotignus)
Bishop Fernando de Almeida (Cotignus) (died ) Bishop of Nevers

Source(s):
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast