Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Dominikus von Almesloe

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1704Born
24 Jun 172824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
28 Jan 174338.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
28 Jan 174338.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
1 Mar 176056.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franz Dominikus von Almesloe
Bishop Franz Dominikus von Almesloe (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJanwowiez

  • a priest for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,743, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 142, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast