Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Allen

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1529AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
13 Mar 1530Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
28 Jul 1534DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Allen
Archbishop John Allen (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 188
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,209
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,530, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast