Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Algaria

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1640Born
13 Sep 166524.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 166524.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 170363.2AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
24 Jul 171372.8DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ettore Algaria
Bishop Ettore Algaria (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 47.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 303
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,703, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast