Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nuņo Alfonso

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoņedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1112Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain
13 Jun 1112AppointedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain
26 Jun 1136DiedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Nuņo Alfonso
Bishop Nuņo Alfonso (died ) Bishop of Mondoņedo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTuy, Diocese of Tuy

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 289, Number 29
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast