Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agnelo Alfieri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1623BornNapoli
18 Mar 167148.1AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
Aug 169269.5DiedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agnelo Alfieri:
Bishop Agnelo Alfieri O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Giovinazzo

Source(s):
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013