Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orontius Alfarano-Capece

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Oropus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1686Born
9 Apr 171326.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172842.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus

MicroData Summary for Orontius Alfarano-Capece
Bishop Orontius Alfarano-Capece (born ) Titular Bishop of Oropus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucugnano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 298
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast