Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Aleandro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1480BornMotta di Livenza
8 Aug 152444.5AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
9 Oct 152444.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brindisi, Italy
28 Feb 152848.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
22 Dec 153656.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Mar 153858.1Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 153858.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
20 Mar 153858.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
30 Jan 154161.0ResignedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
1 Feb 154262.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Aleandro:
Cardinal Girolamo Aleandro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

  • a priest for 17.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c12: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013