Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ippolito Cardinal Aldobrandini (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
19 Apr 162125.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 162125.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
8 Dec 162125.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 162327.4AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
16 Mar 162630.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
6 Feb 163438.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
19 Jul 163842.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Aldobrandini (Jr.) (VIAF: 198713538)
Ippolito Cardinal Aldobrandini (Jr.) (born 1596, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestSanto Domenico du monastère de Monte Magnanapoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a cardinal for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1621
  • op/c1: AT, 6 Aug 2016
  • op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast