Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baccio Cardinal Aldobrandini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1613BornFlorence, Italy
19 Feb 165238.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 165238.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
5 Oct 165441.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
1 Apr 165844.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
21 Jan 166551.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

MicroData Summary for Baccio Aldobrandini:
Cardinal Baccio Aldobrandini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

  • a cardinal for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013