Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Aldegati, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1567AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
5 Oct 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
18 Apr 1570DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Aldegati
Bishop Ambrogio Aldegati O.P. (died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018