Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri de Albertis

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea

Auxiliary Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1459AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vercelli, Italy
2 Mar 1459AppointedTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
19 Oct 1461AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
25 Apr 1475DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Henri de Albertis
Archbishop Henri de Albertis (died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicaea

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 78, and Page 202
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,459, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast