Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Alberti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Nov 1395AppointedBishop of Orte, Italy
13 May 1420AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
19 Oct 1422AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
1438¹DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Alberti:
Bishop Paolo Alberti O.F.M. Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 111, and Page 71
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013